Posted in Uncategorized

Մաթեմատիկա

395)
ա) 94×84=7896
բ) 314×25=7850
գ)81×317=25677
դ)89×563=50107

396)
ա) 2375×809=1921375

408)
Լուծում
1)4×10=40
2)40+20=60
3)60:10=6

398)
ա)

Հեղինակ՝

Թողնել պատասխան

Fill in your details below or click an icon to log in:

WordPress.com Logo

You are commenting using your WordPress.com account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Google photo

You are commenting using your Google account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Twitter picture

You are commenting using your Twitter account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Facebook photo

You are commenting using your Facebook account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Connecting to %s