Posted in Uncategorized

Մաթեմատիկայի առաջադրանք

6x40x5=(40×5)x6=200×6=1200

5x20x314=(20×5)x314=100×314=31400

70x50x40=(70×50)x40=3500×40=140000

6x5x6x5x6x5=(5×6)x(5×6)x(5×6)=900×30=27000

3x3x5x6+8x9x2x5=(5×3)x(3×6)+(9×5)x(2×8)x=720+270=990

Հեղինակ՝

Թողնել պատասխան

Fill in your details below or click an icon to log in:

WordPress.com Logo

You are commenting using your WordPress.com account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Google photo

You are commenting using your Google account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Twitter picture

You are commenting using your Twitter account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Facebook photo

You are commenting using your Facebook account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Connecting to %s